Thomas v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Kenneth M. Thomas
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv22934
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 Order to Show Cause, by United States Of America. (Williams, Dwayne)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dwayne Edward Williams on behalf of United States Of America. Attorney Dwayne Edward Williams added to party United States Of America(pty:dft). (Williams, Dwayne)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LIMITED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - 28 U.S.C. 2255 REGARDING TIMELINESS OF MOTION TO VACATE. On or before September 10, 2019, the respondent shall file a response to this show cause order regarding its position on the timeliness of this federal petition. Show Cause Response due by 9/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (cds)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 1:12-cr-20571-RNS), filed by Kenneth M. Thomas.(cds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Represented By: Dwayne Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?