Ware v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Christopher Ware
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2019cv22944
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Christopher Ware (Hoffman, Paul)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. (Applin, Nicholas)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Attorney Nicholas Allen Applin added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.(pty:dft). (Applin, Nicholas)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. (drz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. a Liberian Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11818732, filed by Christopher Ware. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hoffman, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.
Represented By: Nicholas Allen Applin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ware
Represented By: Paul M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?