Fernandez, Villa, and Garcia, a Partnership v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Fernandez, Villa, and Garcia, a Partnership
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv22948
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for December 18, 2019, 12:00 p.m.. (Kleinman, Eric)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Eric Kleinman, Esq.; Mediation Hearing set for 12/18/2019 12:00 PM. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that by 8/15/2019 the parties shall submit a proposed order scheduling mediation in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Scottsdale Insurance Company, Eric Kleinman. Mediation Hearing set for 12/18/2019 at 12:00 p.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed mediation order)(Seale, Nyasha)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fernandez, Villa, and Garcia, a Partnership (Diego, Ramon)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 2/1/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Scheduling Form)(Seale, Nyasha)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Seale, Nyasha)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company (Seale, Nyasha)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Removal Status Report due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Civil Cover Sheet. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11818943, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scottsdale Annual Report, #2 Exhibit Property Deed, #3 Exhibit Interrogatories to Plaintiff & Plaintiff's Response to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit Property Deed, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Estimate, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit State Court Records)(Seale, Nyasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez, Villa, and Garcia, a Partnership v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Nyasha Simone Seale
Represented By: Lucie Ailene Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernandez, Villa, and Garcia, a Partnership
Represented By: Ramon Julio Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?