Barrakuda Limited v. Zazaby Jewels, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barrakuda Limited
Defendant: Duty Free World, Inc., Mayra Del Valle and Zazaby Jewels, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23004
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ian Feldman on behalf of Mayra Del Valle, Duty Free World, Inc., Zazaby Jewels, Inc. (Feldman, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's, Barrakuda Limited, Complaint. Defendants shall file a response on or before October 10, 2019. All other deadlines shall remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/12/2019. (kml)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Mayra Del Valle, Duty Free World, Inc., Zazaby Jewels, Inc.. Attorney Michael Ian Feldman added to party Mayra Del Valle(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Ian Feldman added to party Duty Free World, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Ian Feldman added to party Zazaby Jewels, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Feldman, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Mayra Del Valle, Duty Free World, Inc., Zazaby Jewels, Inc. (pes)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Barrakuda Limited re #1 Complaint filed by Barrakuda Limited (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Proposed Summons to individual defendant, #2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons to Zazaby Jewels, Inc., #3 Summon(s) Proposed Summons to Duty Free World, Inc.) (Giberson, Guy)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11829382, filed by Barrakuda Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Giberson, Guy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrakuda Limited v. Zazaby Jewels, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duty Free World, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ian Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayra Del Valle
Represented By: Michael Ian Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zazaby Jewels, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ian Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrakuda Limited
Represented By: Guy F. Giberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?