Lexington Insurance Company v. Deauville Associates LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company and Beach Beauty
Defendant: John Does (1-20), XYZ Partnerships (1-20), Deauville Associates LLC and ABC Company (1-20)
Case Number: 1:2019cv23034
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ch1)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion. Re: #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Deauville Associates LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2019 Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (jw)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Dornstein, Scott)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FA. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lexington Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Dornstein, Scott) Modified Relief on 8/29/2019 (ls).
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint , Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 9/3/2019) by Deauville Associates LLC. (Jackson, Valerie)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Valerie M. Jackson on behalf of Deauville Associates LLC. Attorney Valerie M. Jackson added to party Deauville Associates LLC(pty:dft). (Jackson, Valerie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Deauville Associates LLC. (drz)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11833614, filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summon(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dornstein, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexington Insurance Company v. Deauville Associates LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott J. Dornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beach Beauty
Represented By: Scott J. Dornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (1-20)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Partnerships (1-20)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deauville Associates LLC
Represented By: Valerie M. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Company (1-20)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?