Cataffo v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul Cataffo
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23056
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING TRIAL: Discovery due by 2/26/2020. In Limine Motions due by 3/2/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2020. Motions due by 3/2/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/24/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Calendar Call set for 6/25/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Royal Caribbean Cruise Ltd., Other Affiliate Paul Hehir for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Probst, Bryan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Bryan Edward Probst added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Probst, Bryan)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Paul Cataffo. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Holzberg, Glenn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (amb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11837726, filed by Paul Cataffo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Holzberg, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cataffo v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Cataffo
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Edward Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?