Chemical Bank v. Lascia Fluire 2008 Hampton 630 Pilot House et al
Plaintiff: Chemical Bank
Defendant: Lascia Fluire 2008 Hampton 630 Pilot House, Official Number 1263635, Hull Number IEW631081708 and Harry J. Hurley
Case Number: 1:2019cv23080
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 3/10/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga). Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Chemical Bank (Wolfe, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Chemical Bank (Wolfe, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemical Bank (Wolfe, David)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that by 9/19/2019 Plaintiff shall comply with the #10 Order. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 9/16/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to Lascia Fluire 2008 Hampton 630 Pilot House, Official Number 1263635, Hull Number IEW631081708. (ar2)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian; National Liquidators appointed. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint National Liquidators as Custodian by Chemical Bank. Responses due by 8/16/2019 (Wolfe, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Warrant for Arrest In Rem Issued as to Lascia Fluire 2008 Hampton 630 Pilot House, Official Number 1263635, Hull Number IEW631081708. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte Motion to Issue Warrant for Arrest. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Chemical Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, Summons & Verified Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Ex. 2, Order Directing Issuance of Warrant of Arrest, #3 Warrant Ex. 3, Warrant for Arrest In Rem)(Wolfe, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Harry J. Hurley, Lascia Fluire 2008 Hampton 630 Pilot House, Official Number 1263635, Hull Number IEW631081708. (ar2)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11841600, filed by Chemical Bank. (Attachments: #1 Designation Verification of Verified Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Summons, Harry J. Hurley, #4 Summon(s) Summons, Lascia Fluire 2008, the Vessel, #5 Exhibit Ex. A, Marine Note & Security Agreement & Preferred Ship Mortgage, #6 Exhibit Ex. B, Assignment, #7 Exhibit Ex. C, Abstract of Title, #8 Exhibit Ex. D, Payment History)(Wolfe, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chemical Bank v. Lascia Fluire 2008 Hampton 630 Pilot House et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lascia Fluire 2008 Hampton 630 Pilot House, Official Number 1263635, Hull Number IEW631081708
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry J. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chemical Bank
Represented By: David Andrew Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?