Piper Aircraft, Inc. v. Piper Aircraft Corporation et al
Appellee: John Charles Capra and Piper Aircraft Corporation
Appellant: Piper Aircraft, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23303
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant shall file its initial brief on or before October 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/4/2019. (dpa)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief by Piper Aircraft, Inc.. Responses due by 10/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(Alexander, Vincent)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 10/4/2019. (jc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 5/28/19 before Judge Robert A Mark, 1-84 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2019. (dcn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Piper Aircraft, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet from Case 91-31884-RAM, #2 Docket Sheet from Case 15-1390-RAM, #3 Appellant's Designation, #4 Appellee Piper Irrevocable Trust's Designation, #5 Appellee Capra's List of Designated Items, #6 Appellee Capra's Designated Items from Case 91-31884-RAM, #7 Appellee Capra's Designated Items from Case 15-1390-RAM)(dcn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Piper Aircraft, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 91-31884-RAM, filed by Piper Aircraft, Inc..(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piper Aircraft, Inc. v. Piper Aircraft Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John Charles Capra
Represented By: Jay Michael Sakalo
Represented By: Jeffrey Ira Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Piper Aircraft Corporation
Represented By: James Daryl Gassenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Piper Aircraft, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent Frank Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?