900 Retail 101, LLC v. Office of the US Trustee
Appellant: 900 Retail 101, LLC
Appellee: Office of the US Trustee
Case Number: 1:2019cv23333
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 900 Retail 101, LLC (Behar, Brian)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Marcia G. Cooke for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 9/24/19. Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 Response to Motion by 900 Retail 101, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by 900 Retail 101, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Docket Sheet)(lle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 10/4/2019. (jc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on July 23, 2019 before Judge Robert A Mark, 1-24 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2019. (lle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on July 16, 2019 before Judge Robert A Mark, 1-20 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2019. (lle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on June 20, 2019 before Judge Robert A Mark, 1-28 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2019. (lle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 **AMENDED TO CORRECT ECF#11 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on May 23, 2019 before Judge Robert A Mark, 1-19 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2019. (lle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 6/20/2019 before Judge Robert A Mark, 1-28 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: 305-358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2019. (lle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by 900 Retail 101, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 APPELLANT DESIGNATION, #3 APPELLEE DESIGNATION)(lle)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Office of the US Trustee. Replies due by 9/5/2019. (Kelso, Jill)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jill Ellen Kelso on behalf of Office of the US Trustee. Attorney Jill Ellen Kelso added to party Office of the US Trustee(pty:e). (Kelso, Jill)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by 900 Retail 101, LLC. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Edwards, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by 900 Retail 101, LLC (Edwards, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 [DUPLICATE ENTRY] Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals. (jc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by 900 Retail 101, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-25049-RAM, filed by 900 Retail 101, LLC.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 900 Retail 101, LLC v. Office of the US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: 900 Retail 101, LLC
Represented By: Robert Joseph Edwards
Represented By: Brian Scott Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Office of the US Trustee
Represented By: Steven D. Schneiderman
Represented By: Jill Ellen Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?