Franquiyama Holdings, Inc. v. Araque Tamayo
Plaintiff: Franquiyama Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Humberto Araque Tamayo
Case Number: 1:2019cv23344
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 9/30/2020., Motions due by 10/5/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/27/2020., Calendar Call set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2020 10:45 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Bench Trial set for 2/8/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings for Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (jw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Humberto Araque Tamayo. (Hadaway, Brant)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document All Defendants. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Franquiyama Holdings, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (ch1)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brant Collin Hadaway on behalf of Humberto Araque Tamayo. Attorney Brant Collin Hadaway added to party Humberto Araque Tamayo(pty:dft). (Hadaway, Brant)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Humberto Araque Tamayo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Revilla, Crystal)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Crystal Lynn Revilla on behalf of Humberto Araque Tamayo. Attorney Crystal Lynn Revilla added to party Humberto Araque Tamayo(pty:dft). (Revilla, Crystal)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Diaz, Jr on behalf of Humberto Araque Tamayo. Attorney Michael Diaz, Jr added to party Humberto Araque Tamayo(pty:dft). (Diaz, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Franquiyama Holdings, Inc.. Franquiyama Holdings, Inc. served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Bos, Andrea)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Humberto Araque Tamayo. (mc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11890902, filed by Franquiyama Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bos, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franquiyama Holdings, Inc. v. Araque Tamayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humberto Araque Tamayo
Represented By: Crystal Lynn Revilla
Represented By: Michael Diaz, Jr.
Represented By: Brant Collin Hadaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franquiyama Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Leslie Bos
Represented By: Daniel Eric Vielleville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?