Gomez v. M10 Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Andres Gomez
Defendant: M10 Motors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv23372
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Set Answer Due Deadline per DE 10 Order: M10 Motors, LLC response due 11/4/2019. (kpe)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown in the unopposed Motion, Defendant shall file its Answer/Response by November 4, 2019. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/1/2019. (abu)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by M10 Motors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Massillon, Lindsay)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File, for good cause shown in the unopposed Motion. Response/Answer now due by October 3, 2019. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 9/4/2019. (abu)
September 3, 2019 Set Answer Due Deadline per DE 8 Order: M10 Motors, LLC response due 10/3/2019. (kpe)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by M10 Motors, LLC. Attorney Lindsay Marie Massillon added to party M10 Motors, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Massillon, Lindsay)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Verified Certificate of Plaintiff's Counsel Regarding Prior Filings Under the Americans with Disabilities Act by Anthony Joseph Perez on behalf of Andres Gomez (Perez, Anthony)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Andres Gomez. M10 Motors, LLC served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Of Referral And Of Court Practice In ADA Cases. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to M10 Motors, LLC. (kpe)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M10 Motors, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11895362, filed by Andres Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. M10 Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M10 Motors, LLC
Represented By: Lindsay Marie Massillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Gomez
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?