Selective Advisor Group, LLC v. NLG, LLC.
Appellee: NLG, LLC.
Appellant: Selective Advisor Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv23416
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 Appellee's BRIEF by NLG, LLC.. (Gabbe, Astrid)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 Appellant's BRIEF by Selective Advisor Group, LLC. (Langley, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Selective Advisor Group, LLC. Replies due by 9/27/2019. (Langley, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 10/21/2019. (jc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 08/08/2019 before Judge A. Jay Cristol, 1-14 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2019. (dcn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 06/25/19 before Judge A. Jay Cristol, 1-24 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2019. (dcn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Selective Advisor Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Cross-Appeal, #3 Appellant's Designation, #4 Appellant's Statement of Issues)(dcn)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Appellee's BRIEF by NLG, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Gabbe, Astrid)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Sanctions by NLG, LLC.. Attorney Astrid Evelyn Gabbe added to party NLG, LLC.(pty:e). (Gabbe, Astrid)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Appellant's BRIEF by Selective Advisor Group, LLC. (Langley, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by SELECTIVE ADVISOR GROUP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(lle)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 19-14602-BKC AJC, filed by SELECTIVE ADVISOR GROUP, LLC.(lle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selective Advisor Group, LLC v. NLG, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NLG, LLC.
Represented By: Juan Ramirez, Jr.
Represented By: Astrid Evelyn Gabbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Selective Advisor Group, LLC
Represented By: David William Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?