Romero v. Swacina et al
Plaintiff: Fernando Romero
Defendant: Linda Swacina, Field Office Directo Kristian M. Parker and Kristian M. Parker
Case Number: 1:2019cv23454
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fernando Romero (Urizar, Mario)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fernando Romero re #4 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 USPS Service and Tracking)(Urizar, Mario)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kristian M. Parker, Linda Swacina, U.S. Attorney General and United States Attorneys Office. (drz)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11910757, filed by Fernando Romero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Appendix)(Urizar, Mario)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Swacina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Romero
Represented By: Mario Rene Urizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Swacina
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Directo Kristian M. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristian M. Parker
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?