Ariza v. ALDO U.S., INC.
Plaintiff: Victor Ariza
Defendant: ALDO U.S., INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23457
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ( Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: ( Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro., Calendar Call set for 4/3/2020 at 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro., Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2019. Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Expert Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Fact Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2020. Motions due by 2/14/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Victor Ariza (Hannah, Roderick)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference by Victor Ariza re #6 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hannah, Roderick)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant, Aldo U.S Inc's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by ALDO U.S., INC.. Attorney Marlin Kareem Green added to party ALDO U.S., INC.(pty:dft). (Green, Marlin)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Initial Planning Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Victor Ariza. ALDO U.S., INC. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Duran, Pelayo)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON STATE LAW CLAIMS. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Count Two of Plaintiffs Complaint (D.E. 1) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ALDO U.S., INC. (amb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALDO U.S., INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11912001, filed by Victor Ariza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summon(s))(Duran, Pelayo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariza v. ALDO U.S., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Ariza
Represented By: Roderick Victor Hannah
Represented By: Pelayo M. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALDO U.S., INC.
Represented By: Marlin Kareem Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?