Cox v. Diveroli et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Bevan Cox
Defendant: Efraim Diveroli, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., WB Studio Enterprises, Inc., Guy Lawson, Warner Bros. Pictures, Estate of Ross Reback, Simon & Schuster, Inc., Incarcerated Entertainment LLC, Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc. and RatPac-Dune Entertainment LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv23483
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Efraim Diveroli, Incarcerated Entertainment LLC, Guy Lawson, RatPac-Dune Entertainment LLC, Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., WB Studio Enterprises, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Warner Bros. Pictures. (mc)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Matthew Bevan Cox (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s)) (Walsh, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO FILE SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE. On or before September 27, 2019, Plaintiff shall file proof that summonses have been issued as to all Defendants. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STRIKING NOTICE TO ATTACH EXHIBITS re #9 Notice (Other) filed by Matthew Bevan Cox Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Main Document 10 replaced on 9/16/2019) (ebz).
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 STRICKEN NOTICE by Matthew Bevan Cox to Attach Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s)) (Walsh, Michael) Modified to STRIKE per ORDER DE#10 on 9/16/2019 (ebz).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Within twenty-one (21) days of an appearance by a Defendant in this case, the parties are directed to prepare and file a joint scheduling report, as required by Local Rule 16.1. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Incarcerated Entertainment LLC, Estate of Ross Reback, Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., Guy Lawson, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Warner Bros. Pictures, WB Studio Enterprises, Inc. and RatPac-Dune Entertainment LLC. (Walsh, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Dennis Walsh on behalf of Matthew Bevan Cox (Walsh, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE.(Copy of the Complaint, Exhibits and AO 121 form mailed out) (ebz)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Filer is instructed to refile an individual summons per defendant for issuance.. (ebz)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ebz)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Efraim Diveroli, Efraim Diveroli. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11917837, filed by Matthew Bevan Cox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Walsh, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Diveroli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efraim Diveroli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WB Studio Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros. Pictures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Ross Reback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Incarcerated Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RatPac-Dune Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bevan Cox
Represented By: Michael Dennis Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?