Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Ramos et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Jose Ramos and Colombia's Grill, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv23541
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. ORDER DISMISSING CASE The Clerk of Court SHALL administratively close this case. All future hearings are CANCELLED and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Danz, Alan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Entry of Default as to Jose Ramos, Colombia's Grill Inc. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 9/30/2019. (amb)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Clerk to Enter Default(s) as to Colombia's Grill, Inc, Jose Ramos, ( Motion for Final Default Judgment against Defendants, duly supported by affidavits and other documentation and a proposed Final Order due by 10/14/2019.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT signed by : JOSE RAMOS. AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Danz, Alan)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference: Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/4/2019, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Via U.S. Mail) (amb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Colombia's Grill, Inc, Jose Ramos. (amb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FACTUAL ALLEGATIONS against Colombia's Grill, Inc, Jose Ramos. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11928790, filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Danz, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Ramos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colombia's Grill, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Alan David Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?