De Mello E Silva v. CitiBank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Fellype Gabriel De Mello E Silva
Defendant: CitiBank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23547
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Scheduling Report and Proposed Scheduling Order re #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by CitiBank, N.A.. Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Defendant CitiBank, N.A. must respond to the Complaint by October 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/23/2019. (chd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by CitiBank, N.A.. Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party CitiBank, N.A.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 11/1/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CitiBank, N.A.. (cbr)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Fellype Gabriel De Mello E Silva (Arce, Ricardo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CitiBank, N.A.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11929094, filed by Fellype Gabriel De Mello E Silva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Arce, Ricardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Mello E Silva v. CitiBank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fellype Gabriel De Mello E Silva
Represented By: Ricardo Andres Arce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiBank, N.A.
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?