Sale v. Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jon Sale, as Receiver and Jon A. Sale
Defendant: Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23563
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.. Answer due 10/30/2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Jon A. Sale. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 9/30/2019. (mmc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.. Attorney Carmen Contreras-Martinez added to party Ferrari Financial Services, Inc. (pty:dft). Responses due by 10/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Contreras-Martinez, Carmen) Modified Relief on 9/27/2019 (ls).
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 5 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #3 Summons Issued filed by Jon A. Sale. (jas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jon A. Sale re #1 Complaint, of Filing Proof of Service on Defendant (Attachments: #1 proof of service) (Visconti, Melissa)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.. (ebz)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11930575, filed by Jon Sale, as Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) - Ferrari Financial)(Visconti, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sale v. Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Sale, as Receiver
Represented By: Melissa Damian Visconti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon A. Sale
Represented By: Melissa Damian Visconti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Carmen Contreras-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?