Sale v. Mercedes Benz Financial Services USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Jon Sale, as Receiver and Jon Sale
Defendant: Mercedes Benz Financial Services USA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv23564
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 ***Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated per Order DE#12 . (drz)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2019., Discovery due by 5/5/2020., Expert Discovery due by 5/5/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 12/17/2019., Miscellaneous Deadline 5/19/2020., In Limine Motions due by 5/27/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 5/27/2020., Motions due by 5/27/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/17/2020., Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 8/25/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 5/19/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Jon Sale (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Visconti, Melissa)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jon Sale identifying Other Affiliate Bright Smile Financing, LLC, Other Affiliate BRR Block Inc., Other Affiliate DIGI South LLC, Other Affiliate Ganador Enterprises, LLC, Other Affiliate Media Pay LLC, Other Affiliate Ruderman Family Trust, Other Affiliate Western Alliance Bank, Other Affiliate 1 Global Capital LLC, Other Affiliate 1 West Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Bright Smile Trust, Other Affiliate Carl Ruderman, Other Affiliate Securities and Exchange Commission for Jon Sale (Visconti, Melissa)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by Mercedes Benz Financial Services USA, LLC. by 11/15/2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Jon Sale. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Mercedes Benz Financial Services USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kirk, Donald)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald R. Kirk on behalf of Mercedes Benz Financial Services USA, LLC. Attorney Donald R. Kirk added to party Mercedes Benz Financial Services USA, LLC(pty:dft). (Kirk, Donald)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Jon Sale re #1 Complaint, of Filing Proof of Service on Defendant (Attachments: #1 proof of service) (Visconti, Melissa)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Beth Bloom for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 08/29/2019. Chief Judge K. Michael Moore no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mercedes Benz Financial Services USA, LLC. (drz)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mercedes Benz Financial Services USA, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11930584, filed by Jon Sale, as Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) - Mercedes Benz Financial Srv.)(Visconti, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sale v. Mercedes Benz Financial Services USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Sale, as Receiver
Represented By: Melissa Damian Visconti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Sale
Represented By: Melissa Damian Visconti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Benz Financial Services USA, LLC
Represented By: Donald R. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?