Early v. Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD
Plaintiff: Shannon Lynn Early and Sharon Lynn Early
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD
Case Number: 1:2019cv23566
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams.), Referring Case to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 2/17/2020.) Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Sharon Lynn Early (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule Jointly Proposed by the Parties)(Gurian, Michelle)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD identifying Other Affiliate Paul Hehir for Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD (Alcivar, Natasha)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. Attorney Natasha K. Alcivar added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD(pty:dft). (Alcivar, Natasha)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. (pcs)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11930615, filed by Shannon Lynn Early. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Brais, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Early v. Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Lynn Early
Represented By: Keith Steven Brais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Lynn Early
Represented By: Keith Steven Brais
Represented By: Michelle Yariz Gurian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD
Represented By: Natasha K. Alcivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?