Maxwell v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yvonne Maxwell
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23574
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Yvonne Maxwell (Hoffman, Paul)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Ginsberg, Randy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Randy Scott Ginsberg added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Ginsberg, Randy)
September 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per Order DE#5 . Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/18/2019 (drz)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Yvonne Maxwell. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Hoffman, Paul)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (drz)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11932309, filed by Yvonne Maxwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hoffman, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Randy Scott Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Maxwell
Represented By: Paul M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?