Chavez v. Coro
Plaintiff: Rebeca Chavez
Defendant: Orlando Coro
Case Number: 1:2019cv23577
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint. #18 . The Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, consistent with the Court's prior order #19 , by no later than November 1, 2019. If the Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by the deadline, the Court may close the case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER: denying the Plaintiff's motion for a hearing on the motion to dismiss as moot. 13 . The Court already ruled on Chavez's motion to dismiss on October 7, 2019. #19 . Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 First Certificate of Other Affiliates by Orlando Coro identifying Corporate Parent Sanchez & Chavez Trucking LLC(an LLC Company) for Orlando Coro (Angulo, Yelina)
October 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Striking #16 Notice (Other) filed by Orlando Coro by Orlando Coro (Angulo, Yelina)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Amend the Complaint and Request for Extension of Time #1 Complaint ( Responses due by 10/17/2019), MOTION for Extension of Time to Retain Counsel by Rebeca Chavez. (mee)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement event and ensure all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents are entered. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (kpe)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 STRICKEN per DE #16 NOTICE by Orlando Coro Certificate of Interested Parties and Corproate Disclosure Statements (Angulo, Yelina) Text Modified on 10/11/2019 (cbr).
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint filed by Orlando Coro. (Angulo, Yelina)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Parties/Certificate of Other Affiliates by Rebeca Chavez identifying Corporate Parent Sanchez & Chavez Trucking LLC(an LLC Company) for Rebeca Chavez (mee)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 Request of Hearing/MOTION for Hearing re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint , for image see d.e. #12 by Rebeca Chavez. (mee)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition to Defendant Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing/RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint filed by Rebeca Chavez. Replies due by 10/8/2019. (mee)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Rebeca Chavez. Orlando Coro served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (mee)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yelina Angulo on behalf of Orlando Coro (Angulo, Yelina)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint by Orlando Coro. Attorney Yelina Angulo added to party Orlando Coro(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Angulo, Yelina)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 7 Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant. Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # _19cv23357. (mee)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Orlando Coro. (pes)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 8/27/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100193471. (vt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice Re: #1 Complaint. Civil Cover Sheet Attached. Modified text on 8/27/2019 (pes).
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Orlando Coro. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by Rebeca Chavez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ar2). Modified text on 8/27/2019 (pes).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Coro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Coro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebeca Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?