Lopez Castanon et al v. District Director for District 9 Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Marianela Arauco Palazzotto and Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon
Defendant: Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, District Director for District 9 Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, USCIS and Service Center Director
Case Number: 1:2019cv23632
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Stay of Removal filed by Marianela Arauco Palazzotto, Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Revocation of Release, #2 Exhibit B - Order of Supervision, #3 Exhibit C - Judge Wolf Order)(Prada, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Marianela Arauco Palazzotto, Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon (Prada, Mark)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Stay of Removal filed by Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, District Director for District 9 Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Service Center Director, USCIS. Replies due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Assistant Field Office Director, Liana J. Castano)(Fidler, Stephanie)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Re: #7 Motion to Stay of Removal, for good cause shown in the second unopposed motion:Defendants' Response now due by 10/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/10/2019. (EGT)
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Stay of Removal by Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, District Director for District 9 Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Service Center Director, USCIS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fidler, Stephanie)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Re: #7 Motion to Stay Removal, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion and based on the representations set forth in the motion:Defendants' Response now due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/4/2019. (EGT)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion by Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, District Director for District 9 Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Service Center Director, USCIS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fidler, Stephanie)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Release from Custody by Marianela Arauco Palazzotto, Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon re #11 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 9 Order, , #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, 14 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Prada, Mark) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (kpe).
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Richard Dominguez on behalf of Marianela Arauco Palazzotto, Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon. Attorney Anthony Richard Dominguez added to party Marianela Arauco Palazzotto(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Richard Dominguez added to party Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon(pty:pla). (Dominguez, Anthony)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER Granting #11 Defendants motion for extension of time to respond to emergency motion, for good cause shown and notwithstanding the opposition. In light of the representation that removal was not possible before the extended response date, coupled with the Courts stay order, the four day extension will not cause undue prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 9/30/2019. (EGT)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER STAYING REMOVAL OF PETITIONER MIGUEL ANGEL LOPEZ CASTANON. In light of the emergency nature of the motion, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Petitioner Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon's removal is STAYED pending the Court's disposition of the #7 emergency motion. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/27/2019. (dpa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 9 Order, filed by Marianela Arauco Palazzotto, Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon. Replies due by 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Prada, Mark)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 9 Order, by Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, District Director for District 9 Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Service Center Director, USCIS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A Declaration of James Gamboa)(Fidler, Stephanie)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie I. R. Fidler on behalf of Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, District Director for District 9 Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Service Center Director, USCIS. Attorney Stephanie I. R. Fidler added to party Acting Secretary of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie I. R. Fidler added to party District Director for District 9 Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie I. R. Fidler added to party Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie I. R. Fidler added to party Service Center Director(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie I. R. Fidler added to party USCIS(pty:dft). (Fidler, Stephanie)
September 27, 2019 Set Deadlines per DE 9 Order as to #7 EMERGENCY MOTION. Responses due by 9/30/2019. (kpe)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring expedited response to #7 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion. Due to the emergency relief requested in the Motion, Defendants must file an expedited Response by 5:00 PM on Monday, September 30, 2019. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 9/27/2019. (abu)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING #7 EMERGENCY MOTION for Stay of Removal. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, Plaintiffs' emergency motion #7 is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres to take any appropriate action required by law. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/27/2019. (dpa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Stay of Removal by Marianela Arauco Palazzotto, Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon. Responses due by 10/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A, #2 Exhibit Exh. B, #3 Certification Emergency)(Prada, Mark)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT and petition for writ of habeas corpus against All Defendants, filed by Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon, Marianela Arauco Palazzotto. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Prada, Mark)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marianela Arauco Palazzotto, Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued as to USA, (Prada, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, District Director for District 9 Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kpe)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11945756, filed by Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon, Marianela Arauco Palazzotto. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Summon(s))(Prada, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Castanon et al v. District Director for District 9 Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianela Arauco Palazzotto
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Lopez Castanon
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Stephanie I. R. Fidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director for District 9 Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Stephanie I. R. Fidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Stephanie I. R. Fidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Stephanie I. R. Fidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Center Director
Represented By: Stephanie I. R. Fidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?