Funes v. Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Denis Javier Funes
Defendant: Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and United States Attorney General
Respondent: Attorney General William P. Barr and Director Michael W. Meade
Case Number: 1:2019cv23642
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Ariana Fajardo Orshban, Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney General (Spaccarotella, John)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Ariana Fajardo Orshban, Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney General (Spaccarotella, John)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Respondents have until November 4, 2019 to file a response to the Amended Verified Petition. The parties are reminded their joint scheduling report and Respondents' certificates of interested parties are to be filed by October 11, 2019. (See ECF No. #8 ). Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why writ of habeas should not issue opposing Government request for an extension filed by Denis Javier Funes. (Prada, Mark)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why writ of habeas should not issue filed by Ariana Fajardo Orshban, Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney General. Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Ariana Fajardo Orshban (pty:ip). Replies due by 10/17/2019. (Spaccarotella, John)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting response deadline as to #10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why writ of habeas should not issue: Responses due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C. Spaccarotella on behalf of Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney General. Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party United States Attorney General(pty:dft). (Spaccarotella, John)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Denis Javier Funes (Prada, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why writ of habeas should not issue by Denis Javier Funes. (Prada, Mark)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 10/11/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Denis Javier Funes re #5 Appendix, #4 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #6 Amended Complaint (Prada, Mark)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT "as a matter of course" under FRCP 15(a)(1) against All Defendants, filed by Denis Javier Funes.(Prada, Mark)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 APPENDIX to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Corrected Appendix to be served with Summons by Denis Javier Funes (Prada, Mark)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney General, U.S. Attorney.(kpe)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re Summons Issued as to USA. Correction Image not attached. (kpe)
August 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Attorney General, U.S. Attorney. (kpe)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (kpe)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 113C-11947005, filed by Denis Javier Funes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Motion, #4 Summon(s))(Prada, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Funes v. Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Michael W. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Javier Funes
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director for Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: John C. Spaccarotella
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Represented By: John C. Spaccarotella
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?