UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Silva et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Carlos A. Silva and Lorraine D Silva
Case Number: 1:2019cv23653
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by All Defendants. Response /Answer due by November 21, 2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Carlos A. Silva, Lorraine D Silva. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gil, Frank)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank Eduardo Gil on behalf of Carlos A. Silva, Lorraine D Silva. Attorney Frank Eduardo Gil added to party Carlos A. Silva(pty:dft), Attorney Frank Eduardo Gil added to party Lorraine D Silva(pty:dft). (Gil, Frank)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States of America. Lorraine D Silva served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Wilcove, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States of America. Carlos A. Silva served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Wilcove, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re #3 Summons Issued Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carlos A. Silva, Lorraine D Silva. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) to Carlos A. Silva, #3 Summon(s) to Lorraine D. Silva)(Wilcove, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Silva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos A. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine D Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael N. Wilcove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?