Guerra v. Swacina et al
Plaintiff: Otoniel Guerra
Defendant: Acting Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Linda Swacina
Case Number: 1:2019cv23664
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Otoniel Guerra (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USCIS Approval Confirmation Form I-130) (Dominguez, Anthony)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for Stay Until December 20, 2019 by Acting Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Linda Swacina (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Stipulation for Stay Until December 20, 2019)(Weinkle, James)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Linda Swacina, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (drz)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus, Declaratory, and APA Judicial Review against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11951024, filed by Otoniel Guerra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Exhibit A - I-130 Receipt)(Dominguez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerra v. Swacina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: James Alan Weinkle
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Swacina
Represented By: James Alan Weinkle
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otoniel Guerra
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?