Doe v. Booby Trap, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: BTS North, Inc., BT's On The River, LLC, Abe LNU, The New Mint, LLC, Soli LNU, Wachovia Holdings LLC, PG Investments II, Inc., The Gori Family Limited Partnership, BT's Riverfront Land Holdings, LLC, B&G Opa Land Holdings, LLC, Booby Trap, Inc., P.T.G. Entertainment, Inc., T.K. Promotions, Inc., Adult Club Management LLC and Anthony Namias
Case Number: 1:2019cv23667
Filed: August 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Adult Club Management LLC, B&G Opa Land Holdings, LLC, BT's On The River, LLC, BT's Riverfront Land Holdings, LLC, BTS North, Inc., Booby Trap, Inc., Abe LNU, Soli LNU, Anthony Namias, P.T.G. Entertainment, Inc., PG Investments II, Inc., The Gori Family Limited Partnership, The New Mint, LLC, Wachovia Holdings LLC. (cbr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for all Defendants by Jane Doe re #6 Notice/Stipulation of Substitution of Counsel, filed by Jane Doe, #1 Complaint,, filed by Jane Doe (O'Connell, Kelly)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly Lynn O'Connell on behalf of Jane Doe (O'Connell, Kelly)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Kelly Lynn O'Connell on behalf of Jane Doe instead of prior counsel of record Attorney Kelly O'Connell of the Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC. Substituted for Attorney Kelly O'Connell of The Cochran Firm - Treasure Coast, LLC as incoming attorney. (O'Connell, Kelly)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 12/9/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Adult Club Management LLC, B&G Opa Land Holdings, LLC, BT's On The River, LLC, BT's Riverfront Land Holdings, LLC, Booby Trap, Inc., Abe LNU, Soli LNU, Anthony Namias, P.T.G. Entertainment, Inc., PG Investments II, Inc., The Gori Family Limited Partnership, The New Mint, LLC, Wachovia Holdings LLC. (jc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Name Improperly Added. The Filer failed to enter the Alias name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (jc)
August 31, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
August 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adult Club Management LLC, B&G Opa Land Holdings, LLC, BT's On The River, LLC, BT's Riverfront Land Holdings, LLC, BTS North, Inc., Booby Trap, Inc., Abe LNU, Soli LNU, Anthony Namias, P.T.G. Entertainment, Inc., PG Investments II, Inc., T.K. Promotions, Inc., The Gori Family Limited Partnership, The New Mint, LLC, Wachovia Holdings LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11943196, payment transferred from : 19cv23627, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(O'Connell, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Booby Trap, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTS North, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BT's On The River, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abe LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New Mint, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soli LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PG Investments II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gori Family Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BT's Riverfront Land Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&G Opa Land Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booby Trap, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.T.G. Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.K. Promotions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Club Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Namias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Kelly Lynn O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?