Callis v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Samuel Callis
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv23715
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-07101, filed 10/30/2019. (jua)
October 17, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:19-cv-23715 electronically transferred out to California Northern. (mc)
October 17, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per DE #8 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-158) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 2741 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Samuel Callis. Monsanto Company served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Petosa, Frank)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Samuel Callis (Petosa, Frank)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samuel Callis identifying Other Affiliate Morgan & Morgan, P.A. for Samuel Callis (Petosa, Frank)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (jao)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11961712, filed by Samuel Callis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Petosa, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callis v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Callis
Represented By: T Michael Morgan
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?