Garcia v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Plaintiff: Virginia Vallejo Garcia
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan, District Director Linda Swacina, US Citizenship & Immigration Services, Field Office Directo Rodolfo Nunez, District Director, USCIS District 9 - Miami District Office, Acting Field Office Director, USCIS Miami Field Office, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Case Number: 1:2019cv23750
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
October 20, 2019 Terminate Answer Due Deadline per DE #8 Order. (ar2)
October 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus, by Acting Field Office Director, USCIS Miami Field Office, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, District Director, USCIS District 9 - Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). Attorney Karin D. Wherry added to party Acting Field Office Director, USCIS Miami Field Office(pty:dft), Attorney Karin D. Wherry added to party Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (pty:dft), Attorney Karin D. Wherry added to party District Director, USCIS District 9 - Miami District Office(pty:dft), Attorney Karin D. Wherry added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wherry, Karin)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Virginia Vallejo Garcia. Acting Field Office Director, USCIS Miami Field Office served on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019; District Director, USCIS District 9 - Miami District Office served on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Friz-Garcia, Alexandra)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/15/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Show Cause Response due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Field Office Director, USCIS Miami Field Office, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, District Director, USCIS District 9 - Miami District Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), and U.S. Attorney. (ar2)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. (ar2)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus APA JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11966709, filed by Virginia Vallejo Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 EXHIBIT LIST, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D)(Fonte, Kari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Linda Swacina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Directo Rodolfo Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director, USCIS District 9 - Miami District Office
Represented By: Karin D. Wherry
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Field Office Director, USCIS Miami Field Office
Represented By: Karin D. Wherry
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Karin D. Wherry
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By: Karin D. Wherry
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Vallejo Garcia
Represented By: Kari Ann Fonte
Represented By: Alexandra Paola Friz-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?