Ortiz v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Ortiz
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv23752
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Vacate 924(c) AND 924(o) CONVICTIONS AND SENTENCES UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255 AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by Rodolfo Ortiz. Responses due by 11/12/2019 (Budhrani, Anshu)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anshu Budhrani on behalf of Rodolfo Ortiz. Attorney Anshu Budhrani added to party Rodolfo Ortiz(pty:pla). (Budhrani, Anshu)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Reassignment of Assistant Federal Public Defender by Sara Kane on behalf of Rodolfo Ortiz. Attorney Noticing FPD-MIA terminated.. Attorney Sara Kane added to party Rodolfo Ortiz(pty:pla). (Kane, Sara)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dayron Silverio on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Dayron Silverio added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Silverio, Dayron)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN LIGHT OF ELEVENTH CIRCUIT'S GRANT RE APPLICATION TO FILE SUCCESSIVE MOTION TO VACATE - 28 U.S.C. 2255 BASED ON RETROACTIVITY OF UNITED STATES V. DAVIS., Attorney Noticing-FPD-MIA for Rodolfo Ortiz added for Motion Attacking Sentence/Motion to Vacate Sentence (28 USC 2255). On or before forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this order,the Federal Public Defender shall file a motion to vacate with supporting memorandum of law, in compliance with the local and federal rules governing such filings, addressing with specificity whether the motion should be GRANTED in light of the Supreme Court's decision in Davis. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 9/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) Modified on 10/7/2019 (fbn).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (vjk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 USCA ORDER GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART MOTION (Complaint) to Correct Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 09-cr-20710-JAL), filed by Rodolfo Ortiz.(vjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Ortiz
Represented By: Noticing FPD-MIA
Represented By: Anshu Budhrani
Represented By: Sara Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Represented By: Dayron Silverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?