Deligurt Enterprises Corp. et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Deligurt Enterprises Corp. and Manuel Faustino Goncalves
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Attorney General William P. Barr, Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan and Director Gregory A Richardson
Case Number: 1:2019cv23786
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Diaz on behalf of William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Gregory A Richardson. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party William P. Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Kenneth T Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Gregory A Richardson(pty:dft). (Diaz, Natalie)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Gregory A Richardson, U.S. Attorney's Office. (amb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-11972924, payment transferred from 19cv23779: Deligurt Enterprises Corp et. al. vs. Barr et.al., filed by Deligurt Enterprises Corp., Manuel Faustino Goncalves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) U.S. Attorney General, #3 Summon(s) Acting Secretary of DHS, #4 Summon(s) USCIS Director, #5 Summon(s) USCIS TSC Director, #6 Summon(s) U.S. Attorney's Office)(Rifkin, Larry) Modified text on 9/19/2019 to reflect correct case number (bb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deligurt Enterprises Corp. et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Gregory A Richardson
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deligurt Enterprises Corp.
Represented By: Larry Scott Rifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Faustino Goncalves
Represented By: Larry Scott Rifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?