Doane v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Roy Doane
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv23811
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Roy Doane, Robert Dulberg. (Gavidia, Cesar)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the two-week period commencing 7/7/2020 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 6/30/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kantor, Philip)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Kantor, Philip)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Answer due 10/23/2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Roy Doane. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/8/2019. (mmc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney Philip J. Kantor added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kantor, Philip)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Roy Doane. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Gavidia, Cesar)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (amb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11978435, filed by Roy Doane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit Disability Policy)(Gavidia, Cesar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doane v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Philip J. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Doane
Represented By: Cesar Gavidia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?