Alonso et al v. Western World Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michelle Alonso and Michael Alonso
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv23827
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 4/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/4/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Michael Alonso, Michelle Alonso (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Font, Jose)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Western World Insurance Company re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Joint Motion to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically (Seibert, Troy)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western World Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG for Western World Insurance Company (Seibert, Troy)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT re Removal by Western World Insurance Company (Stape, Maxwell)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11981875, filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Maxwell H. Stape Esquire in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 - Interrogatories to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 1 of 9, #6 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 2 of 9, #7 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 3 of 9, #8 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 4 of 9, #9 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 5 of 9, #10 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 6 of 9, #11 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 7 of 9, #12 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 8 of 9, #13 Exhibit 4 - State Court Pleadings 9 of 9)(Stape, Maxwell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alonso et al v. Western World Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Alonso
Represented By: Jose Pete Font
Represented By: Frantz C Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Alonso
Represented By: Jose Pete Font
Represented By: Frantz C Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: Troy Jonathan Seibert
Represented By: Maxwell Harrison Stape
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?