De Vasconcelos v. Director, Miami Field Office Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Arctrus A De Vasconcelos
Defendant: Acting Secretary, Department Homeland Security and Director, Miami Field Office Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv23848
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Arctrus A De Vasconcelos (Perez-Matos, Cecilia)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 Order to Show Cause by Arctrus A De Vasconcelos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perez-Matos, Cecilia)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Acting Secretary, Department Homeland Security (lbc)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons to #5 Order by Arctrus A De Vasconcelos. (Perez-Matos, Cecilia)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/28/2019). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Show Cause Hearing set for 12/6/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro) Show Cause Response due by 11/1/2019, Replies due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (Proposed Summonses due 9/23/2019). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Wrong Event Selected. Case type changed from MC to CV. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. (pcs)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus against Department of Homeland Security (DHS), US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Miami District. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11985538, filed by Arctrus A De Vasconcelos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perez-Matos, Cecilia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Vasconcelos v. Director, Miami Field Office Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arctrus A De Vasconcelos
Represented By: Cecilia Perez-Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary, Department Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Miami Field Office Service Center, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?