Rodriguez v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Nieves Rodriguez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv23855
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 11/4/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 9/29/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Mediation Deadline 5/18/2020.) Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Join Active Tortfesor, MARK LUNGREN, as a Necessary PartyPlaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Replies due by 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Kelly, Derrick)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Join Active Tortfesor, MARK LUNGREN, as a Necessary Party, Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand by Nieves Rodriguez. Attorney Eric Arthur Falk added to party Nieves Rodriguez(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Falk, Eric)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Kelly, Derrick)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Other Affiliate WSE Investment LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Kelly, Derrick)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derrick Maurice Kelly on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Kelly, Derrick)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before October 8, 2019, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (lfn)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE that attorney Eric Arthur Falk has not been added to this case re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,. For further information, please contact Attorney Admissions at 305-523-5265. (pt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11987786, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. State Court Answer Filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Return of Service, #3 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Answer and Affirmative Defenses and MTD, #5 Exhibit Pleadings and Docket, #6 Exhibit Interrogatories (Redacted), #7 Exhibit Medical Records (Redacted), #8 Exhibit Franco Order, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hamilton, Jerry) Modified on 9/17/2019 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nieves Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?