American General Life Insurance Company v. FIDJ PLLC
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Defendant: FIDJ PLLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv23894
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against FIDJ PLLC, filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guzzi, Gary)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Gary John Guzzi on behalf of American General Life Insurance Company instead of prior counsel of record Kristina Pett and Danielle Shure. . Attorney Gary John Guzzi added to party American General Life Insurance Company(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order A) (Guzzi, Gary)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document FIDJ PLLC. Answer due 11/5/2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by American General Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/23/2019. (mmc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by FIDJ PLLC. Attorney Brenton Neil Ver Ploeg added to party FIDJ PLLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ver Ploeg, Brenton)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by American General Life Insurance Company. FIDJ PLLC served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Pett, Kristina)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FIDJ PLLC. (amb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against FIDJ PLLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11994016, filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ittleman Application, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Pett, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American General Life Insurance Company v. FIDJ PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDJ PLLC
Represented By: Brenton Neil Ver Ploeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristina Beth Pett
Represented By: Danielle Erica Shure
Represented By: Gary John Guzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?