Cypress Property, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Cypress Property, LLC
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23903
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 02:0431
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS #3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Replies due by 11/18/2019. (Rothschild, Philip)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Cypress Property, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DuBosar, Harrison)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS #3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cypress Property, LLC. Responses due by 11/12/2019 (DuBosar, Harrison)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Counterclaims and move to strike affirmative defenses, if warranted, on or before October 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, by Cypress Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DuBosar, Harrison)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before October 11, 2019, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Rothschild, Philip)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal , Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against Cypress Property, LLC by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Counterclaim (7-24-19 letter to Landlord))(Rothschild, Philip)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11995680, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and state court filings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cypress Property Articles of Incorporation and 2019 Annual Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rothschild, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cypress Property, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cypress Property, LLC
Represented By: Harrison Ross DuBosar
Represented By: Howard D. DuBosar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Philip E. Rothschild
Represented By: Brian Kenneth Hole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?