Potter v. Potnetwork Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Potter
Defendant: First Capital Venture, Co., Diamond CBD, Inc. and Potnetwork Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv24017
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 12/13/2019 per DE 19 (cbr)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Plaintiff Kathryn Potter's unopposed motion for a two-week extension of time to file a response to the Defendant's motion to dismiss in light of counsel's family obligations during the week of Thanksgiving. #18 . The Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss is now due on December 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kathryn Potter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tropin, Daniel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Diamond CBD, Inc., First Capital Venture, Co., Potnetwork Holdings, Inc.. Attorney Jonathan David Leinwand added to party Potnetwork Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/29/2019 (Leinwand, Jonathan)
October 28, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Diamond CBD, Inc. response due 11/14/2019; First Capital Venture, Co. response due 11/14/2019. per DE 16 (cbr)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Defendants' motion for an extension of time to file a response to the complaint. #15 . The response to the complaint is now due on November 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Complaint by Diamond CBD, Inc., First Capital Venture, Co.. Attorney Jonathan David Leinwand added to party Diamond CBD, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan David Leinwand added to party First Capital Venture, Co.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leinwand, Jonathan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Compliance (copy of order mailed to all addresses listed on order) re #13 Order, (mee)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON CLERK'S DEFAULT PROCEDURE. The Court orders the Plaintiff to submit a Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by November 4, 2019, consistent withFederal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Plaintiff's motion to appear pro hac vice 16 . Attorney Melissa S. Weiner is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiff Kathryn Potter. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Plaintiff's motion to appear pro hac vice 16 . Attorney Joseph C. Bourne is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiff Kathryn Potter. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (dka)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Melissa S. Weiner. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12047582 by Kathryn Potter. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tropin, Daniel)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph C. Bourne. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12047570 by Kathryn Potter. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tropin, Daniel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kathryn Potter. Diamond CBD, Inc. served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kathryn Potter. First Capital Venture, Co. served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Ostrow, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Melissa S. Weiner and Joseph C. Bourne, mailing date September 30, 2019, (pt)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Diamond CBD, Inc., First Capital Venture, Co., Potnetwork Holdings, Inc.. (mee)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12021990, filed by Kathryn Potter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Ostrow, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potter v. Potnetwork Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Capital Venture, Co.
Represented By: Jonathan David Leinwand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond CBD, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan David Leinwand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potnetwork Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan David Leinwand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Potter
Represented By: Jeffrey Miles Ostrow
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Joshua Robert Levine
Represented By: Daniel Edward Tropin
Represented By: Joseph C. Bourne
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?