Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida, Inc. v. Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida, Inc. and Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II and Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv24440
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Walenz, Samuel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Walenz, Samuel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Walenz, Samuel)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting, ECF No. #8 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Thomas M. Burnett. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting, ECF No. #7 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Danielle E. Marocchi. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting, ECF No. #6 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Bryan Nowicki. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (laa)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Thomas M. Burnett. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12164046 by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walenz, Samuel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Danielle E. Marocchi. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12164023 by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walenz, Samuel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Bryan Nowicki. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12163872 by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Responses due by 12/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walenz, Samuel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Joseph Glazer on behalf of Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida. Attorney Michael Joseph Glazer added to party Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida(pty:pla). (Glazer, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kpe)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12101446, filed by Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D)(Walenz, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida, Inc. v. Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel John Walenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seasons Hospice & Palliative Care of Southern Florida
Represented By: Samuel John Walenz
Represented By: Danielle E. Marocchi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Glazer
Represented By: Bryan Nowicki
Represented By: Thomas M. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?