DE OLIVEIRA VASQUES et al v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Ana Paula COSTA and Roberto DE OLIVEIRA VASQUES
Defendant: Department of State, Consular Chief Rebecca A. PASINI, Consul General SCOTT HAMILTON, Secretary Michael Pompeo, Attorney General William P. Barr, Director Christopher Wray, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of State and Michael R. Pompeo
Case Number: 1:2019cv24469
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Diaz on behalf of William P. Barr, Federal Bureau of Investigation, SCOTT HAMILTON, Rebecca A. PASINI, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State, Christopher Wray. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party William P. Barr(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party SCOTT HAMILTON(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Rebecca A. PASINI(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Michael R. Pompeo(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party United States Department of State(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Christopher Wray(pty:dft). (Diaz, Natalie)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters And Notice of Court Practices And Procedures. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, SCOTT HAMILTON, Rebecca A. PASINI, Michael R. Pompeo, Christopher Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cds)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (cds)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, DECLARATORY, AND OTHER RELIEF against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12105743, filed by Roberto DE OLIVEIRA VASQUES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A. Form I-526 Approval Notice, #4 Exhibit B. Composite Inquiries to Rio de Janeiro Consulate, #5 Exhibit C. 11 September 2018 Response to Congressional Inquiry)(Figueroa-Contreras, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DE OLIVEIRA VASQUES et al v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Paula COSTA
Represented By: Kristin D. Figueroa-Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto DE OLIVEIRA VASQUES
Represented By: Kristin D. Figueroa-Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consular Chief Rebecca A. PASINI
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consul General SCOTT HAMILTON
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Michael Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher Wray
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?