FOX v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JAMES FOX, JR
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc., AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC. and AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC. a Florida Profit Corporation, doing business as Autonation Nissan Kendall
Case Number: 1:2019cv24514
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Markel Arrizabalaga, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 4/8/2020 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Nissan North America, Inc., Markel Arrizabalaga as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/8/2020 at 2:30 p.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Scheduling Mediation)(Seipp, John)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STRIKING INITIAL DISCLOSURES re #17 Initial Disclosure(s) filed by JAMES FOX, JR Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 STRICKEN per Order DE#18 -Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26 (a)(1) by JAMES FOX, JR (Santos, Ernesto) Modified on 12/10/2019 (drz).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ONE DEFENDANT, AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC. (a Florida Profit Corporation,) re #14 Notice (Other) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 11/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (aw)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by JAMES FOX, JR of Voluntary Dismissal (Santos, Ernesto)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, .( Responses due by 11/27/2019) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/21/2020., Discovery due by 8/11/2020., Expert Discovery due by 8/11/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 1/21/2020., Mediation Deadline 8/25/2020., In Limine Motions due by 9/2/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2020., Motions due by 9/2/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/23/2020., Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 12/1/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 8/25/2020.)and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC. identifying Corporate Parent AutoNation, Inc. for AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC. (Seipp, John)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America, Inc. (Seipp, John)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Nissan North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PROPOSED JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER)(Seipp, John)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ernesto L. Santos, Jr on behalf of JAMES FOX, JR. Attorney Ernesto L. Santos, Jr added to party JAMES FOX, JR(pty:pla). (Santos, Ernesto)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC.. Attorney John Carl Seipp, Jr added to party AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Seipp, John)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CIRCUIT COURT DOCKET SHEET) (Seipp, John)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, OF FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF CASSANDRA M. HUGHES) (Seipp, John)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Seipp, John)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Post-Removal Procedures and Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. (Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/22/2019). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12113037, filed by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit B - NNA'S SUBJECT VEHICLE HISTORY, #4 Exhibit C - CARFAX REPORT, #5 Exhibit D - NNA BUSINESS ENTITY INFORMATION, #6 Exhibit E - NNA ANNUAL REPORT, #7 Exhibit F - STATE COURT DOCKET)(Seipp, John) Text Modified on 11/1/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOX v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES FOX, JR
Represented By: Ernesto L. Santos, Jr.
Represented By: Frank Brian Halpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: John Carl Seipp, Jr.
Represented By: Carolina Sofia Pinero
Represented By: Christine L. Welstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC.
Represented By: John Carl Seipp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTONATION USA OF PERRINE, INC. a Florida Profit Corporation, doing business as Autonation Nissan Kendall
Represented By: John Carl Seipp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?