Zerby v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Victor Charles Zerby
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv24551
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Victor Charles Zerby, #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Victor Charles Zerby Recommending that Petitioner's purported 2241 petition be construed as a motion pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3582(c) and TRANSFERRED to Petitioner's underlying criminal case, Case No. 16-20028-CR-UNGARO, and Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DISMISSED AS MOOT. Accordingly, it is further RECOMMENDED that once Petitioners filing is transferred, that this case be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 1/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cary Oren Aronovitz on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Cary Oren Aronovitz added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Aronovitz, Cary)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,. Incorrect District Judge Selected; Corrected by the Clerk. (amb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Judge Darrin P. Gayles no longer assigned to case. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Victor Charles Zerby. (amb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Victor Charles Zerby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zerby v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Charles Zerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Cary Oren Aronovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?