Walton v. Inch
Plaintiff: Wiley Walton
Defendant: Mark Inch
Case Number: 1:2019cv24579
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #3 , #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $5.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Compliance re: Inmate Account Statement by Wiley Walton re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, (cds)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. The Response shall be due by Tuesday, January 21, 2020 due to the Court's holiday closure on Monday, January 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/13/2019. (ac01)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Mark Inch. (Katz, Linda)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by January 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/5/2019. (ac01)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 Order to Show Cause, by Wiley Walton. (cds)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE/ Response by Mark Inch re #6 Order to Show Cause, . Attorney Linda S. Katz added to party Mark Inch(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit email) (Katz, Linda)Text Modified on 11/13/2019 (cqs).
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO RESPONDENT. Respondent shall file the written notice in accordance with the Court's Order to Show Cause immediately, but at the very least no later than 9:00 AM on Friday, November 15, 2019. Show Cause Response due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. On or before forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order, Respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this Petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner filed his/her motion to proceed in forma pauperis but failed to submit the supporting statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months for any institutional account in her name. Accordingly, on or before December 3, 2019, Petitioner shall file the required supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $5.00. Responses due by 12/3/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wiley Walton. (mee)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (mee)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Wiley Walton.(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Linda S. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wiley Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?