LUIS v. VMSB, LLC
Plaintiff: ROLANDO LUIS
Defendant: VMSB, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv24637
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. per DE 9 (cbr)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the notice #8 , which indicates the Parties have reached a settlement in this matter. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal by January 20, 2020. Because this case was brought under the Fair Labor Standards Act, the joint motion of dismissal shall include a motion for approval of the Parties' settlement agreement pursuant to Lynn's Food Stores, Inc. v. United States, 679 F.2d 1350 (11th Cir. 1982). All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. This case is CLOSED for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/18/2019. (jws)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by ROLANDO LUIS (Palma, Zandro)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint, for good cause shown in the unopposed motion:Defendant's Response/Answer now due 12/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/3/2019. (EGT)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by VMSB, LLC. Attorney Eric Robert Thompson added to party VMSB, LLC (pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Eric)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of: Claim by ROLANDO LUIS re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other (Palma, Zandro)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN FLSA CASES. Referring to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to VMSB, LLC. (mee)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VMSB, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12133877, filed by ROLANDO LUIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Palma, Zandro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUIS v. VMSB, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLANDO LUIS
Represented By: Zandro E. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMSB, LLC
Represented By: Eric Robert Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?