Andersen v. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd
Plaintiff: Troy Andersen
Defendant: ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD, Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises and Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. a Liberian Corporation also known as Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. doing business as Royal Caribbean Cruise Line doing business as Royal Caribbean International
Case Number: 1:2019cv24639
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Troy Andersen (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER, #2 Exhibit JOINT CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE)(Smith, Christopher)
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.. Attorney Natasha K. Alcivar added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.(pty:dft). (Alcivar, Natasha)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting in part: #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 12/30/2019 Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re #5 Scheduling Order,, by Troy Andersen. Responses due by 1/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Christopher)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance by Troy Andersen re #6 Order to Show Cause (Smith, Christopher)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Troy Andersen. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Smith, Christopher)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/12/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference: Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/20/2019 Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.. (jas)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jas)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12134084, filed by Troy Andersen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Smith, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andersen v. Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Andersen
Represented By: Christopher Bond Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Represented By: Natasha K. Alcivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises
Represented By: Natasha K. Alcivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. a Liberian Corporation also known as Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. doing business as Royal Caribbean Cruise Line doing business as Royal Caribbean International
Represented By: Natasha K. Alcivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?