Lockwood v. Oceania Cruises S. DE R.L., LLC
Plaintiff: Paul Lockwood
Defendant: OCEANIA CRUISES S. DE R.L., LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv24650
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Referring Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Initial Mediation before Cori Flam Meltzer. Initial Mediation Deadline 2/28/2020. Initial Mediation Hearing set for 2/26/2020 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 1/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (dp)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Paul Lockwood Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Walsh, Peter)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Cori Flam Meltzer as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 2/26/2020 at 10:00 a.m.. (Walsh, Peter)
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Paul Lockwood (Walsh, Peter)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 REFERRAL to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan per DE #7 Order. (yar)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Forth the Court's Policy on Motions for Extension or Stay of the Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/26/19. See attached document for full details. (dp)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of Referral to Initial Mediation and Directing Plaintiff's Counsel to Submit (Within Fourteen Days) Proposed Order Scheduling Initial Mediation. Initial Mediation Deadline 02/28/2020. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/26/19. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (dp)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Referring Discovery Disputes and Certain Pretrial Motions to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan; Directing Parties to File Certificates of Interested Parties; Directing Parties to File a Notice of Refiling And/or of Related Cases; Requiring Completion of Form Consenting to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge; and Requiring Completion of Joint Scheduling Report and Form. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/26/19. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix) (dp)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Oceania Cruises S. DE R.L., LLC. Attorney Rachael Mitchell Fagenson added to party Oceania Cruises S. DE R.L., LLC(pty:dft). (Fagenson, Rachael)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Oceania Cruises S. DE R.L., LLC, filed by Paul Lockwood.(Walsh, Peter)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Paul Lockwood. Oceania Cruises S. DE R.L., LLC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Walsh, Peter)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Oceania Cruises S. DE R.L., LLC. (ail)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OCEANIA CRUISES S. DE R.L., LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12136130, filed by Paul Lockwood. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Singer, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockwood v. Oceania Cruises S. DE R.L., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lockwood
Represented By: David W. Singer
Represented By: Peter G. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANIA CRUISES S. DE R.L., LLC
Represented By: Rachael Mitchell Fagenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?