Campbell v. Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Petitioner: Yvonne Campbell
Case Number: 1:2019cv24687
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk; see DE #5 Motion to Dismiss. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Department of Homeland Security (DHS)(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Diaz, Natalie) Modified text to reflect document as a motion on 11/18/2019 (kpe).
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Attorney Appearance re Noticing INS Attorney on behalf of Department of Homeland Security (DHS). Attorney Noticing INS Attorney added to party Department of Homeland Security (DHS)(pty:dft). (jua)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Perrault Jean-Paul (amb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (amb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 Receipt#: (Not Paid/No IFP), filed by Yvonne Campbell.(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yvonne Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?