Ariza v. Simon's Carol City, Inc.
Plaintiff: Victor Ariza
Defendant: Simon's Carol City, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv24699
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Victor Ariza (Hannah, Roderick)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Victor Ariza. Simon's Carol City, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Hannah, Roderick)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, (Verified Regarding Prior ADA Cases) by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Victor Ariza (Hannah, Roderick)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL, SCHEDULING REPORT, AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. On or before November 21, 2019, Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a verified statement. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Simon's Carol City, Inc.. (jas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Simon's Carol City, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12144032, filed by Victor Ariza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s))(Hannah, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariza v. Simon's Carol City, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Ariza
Represented By: Roderick Victor Hannah
Represented By: Pelayo M. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon's Carol City, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?