Boyles v. Union Security Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Richard Boyles
Defendant: Union Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv24702
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 12/30/2020., Motions due by 1/4/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/26/2021., Calendar Call set for 5/6/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2021 10:15 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Bench Trial set for 5/10/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 1/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (jw)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Union Security Insurance Company. (Pett, Kristina)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Union Security Insurance Company. Answer due 12/30/2019. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Richard Boyles. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 12/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (jw)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Union Security Insurance Company. Attorney Kristina Beth Pett added to party Union Security Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension to Respond to Complaint)(Pett, Kristina)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Richard Boyles. Union Security Insurance Company served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Jessup, Stephen)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Union Security Insurance Company. (kpe)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Union Security Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12144636, filed by Richard Boyles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Jessup, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyles v. Union Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Boyles
Represented By: Stephen Francis Jessup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristina Beth Pett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?