Braithwaite v. Bascom Palmer Eye Institute, University of Miami
Plaintiff: Willie B Braithwaite
Defendant: Bascolm Palmer Eye Institute and Bascom Palmer Eye Institute, University of Miami
Case Number: 1:2019cv24712
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Bascom Palmer Eye Institute, University of Miami (Ragatz, Teresa)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan Daniel Isicoff on behalf of Bascom Palmer Eye Institute, University of Miami. Attorney Jordan Daniel Isicoff added to party Bascom Palmer Eye Institute, University of Miami(pty:dft). (Isicoff, Jordan)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re #9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Bascom Palmer Eye Institute, University of Miami. Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isicoff, Eric)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer due 1/16/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 1/7/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Bascom Palmer Eye Institute, University of Miami. Attorney Eric David Isicoff added to party Bascom Palmer Eye Institute, University of Miami(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isicoff, Eric)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/11/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bascom Palmer Eye Institute, University of Miami. (kpe)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Willie B Braithwaite re #1 Complaint filed by Willie B Braithwaite (Pizzi, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Darrin P. Gayles recused. Case reassigned to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Marcia G. Cooke recused. Case reassigned to Judge Darrin P. Gayles for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (vjk) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/21/2019) (vjk). Modified pdf document on 11/21/2019 (vjk).
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bascolm Palmer Eye Institute. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12145652, filed by Willie B Braithwaite. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pizzi, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braithwaite v. Bascom Palmer Eye Institute, University of Miami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie B Braithwaite
Represented By: Michael A. Pizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bascolm Palmer Eye Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bascom Palmer Eye Institute, University of Miami
Represented By: Jordan Daniel Isicoff
Represented By: Teresa Ragatz
Represented By: Eric David Isicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?